IL SB0684 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Finance Act. Changes the repeal date of provisions concerning the Capital Development Board Revolving Fund to July 1, 2021 (currently, July 1, 2017). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CDB REVOLVING FUND-REPEAL DATE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-04-25HouseArrived in House
2017-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017
2017-03-14SenateSecond Reading
2017-02-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2017
2017-02-09SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2017-02-01SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-01-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-26SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.857Amended CodeCitation Text
301056z-100Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback