IL SB0675 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Adds to the definition of "essential parts" a bed, front bumper, rear bumper, and, for motorcycles, fairings, fuel tanks, and forks. Removes other items from the definition. Provides that the Secretary of State may cancel any license or permit upon determining that the holder has assisted an out-of-state resident in acquiring an Illinois driver's license or identification card by providing or allowing the out-of-state resident to use his or her Illinois address of residence and is complicit in distributing and forwarding the Illinois driver's license or identification card to the out-of-state resident. Provides that operating a driver training school without a license issued by the Secretary of State is a Class A misdemeanor for a first offense and a Class 4 felony for a second or subsequent offense. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-PARTS/LICENSES/SCHOOLS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000
2017-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation
2017-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation
2017-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3 - May 30, 2017
2017-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3
2017-05-29HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 109-002-000
2017-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-05-29HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 005-004-000
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-05-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-04-25HouseArrived in House
2017-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017
2017-03-14SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass Transportation; 016-000-000
2017-02-01SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-01-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-26SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62551-118Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-201Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-401Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=675&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0675.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0675eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0675enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0675ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0675ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0675ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0675_04252017_010000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0675_05292017_003000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0675_05312017_047001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0675_05312017_047000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback