IL SB0667 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Comprehensive Health Insurance Plan Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-07-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2019-06-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2019-05-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2019
2019-05-28SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2019-05-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-28SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2151051Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback