IL SB0647 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mortgage Foreclosure Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that provisions concerning an additional fee paid by residential foreclosure plaintiffs are operative until January 1, 2020 (instead of January 1, 2018). Provides that provisions concerning an additional fee paid by purchasers at a judicial sale are operative and become inoperative on January 1, 2020 (instead of January 1, 2017). Repeals the Section on March 2, 2020 (instead of March 2, 2017). Provides that specified actions taken before the effective date of the amendatory Act are ratified, validated, and confirmed. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ABANDONED RESIDENTIAL PROPERTY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 49 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 21 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-30HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Tabled
2017-05-30HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. André Thapedi
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-049-000
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseJudicial Note Filed
2017-05-30HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-05-30HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2017-05-29HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-05-29HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-05-29HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-05-29HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-24HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-24HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-24HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-05-03HouseArrived in House
2017-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 031-021-000
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-26SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-04-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Financial Institutions; 005-003-000
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-02-01SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2017-01-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
735515-1504.1Amended CodeCitation Text
735515-1507.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback