IL SB0640 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0309
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0309
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Other Social Services Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that in a county under township organization, a township may provide, from moneys received and collected for public aid to all persons eligible for General Assistance under the Code, funds and administer programs for providing in-kind aid in meeting basic maintenance requirements, including, but not limited to, food, paper goods, toiletries, and clothing, to persons who are poor, indigent, homeless, or in need of immediate assistance, in addition to financial aid provided under the Code.
Title
GENERAL ASSISTANCE-IN-KIND AID
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] |
Sen. Diane Pappas [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0309 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2019-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; T. Cullerton |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 4-1.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |