IL SB0640 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Workers' Compensation Act and the Workers' Occupational Diseases Act. Provides that the arbitrator or the Commission may correct a clerical error or error in computation within 21 (instead of 15) days after the date of receipt of an award by the arbitrator or any decision on review of the Commission and may recall the original award on arbitration or decision on review and issue the corrected award or decision. Provides that the time within which a petition for judicial review must be filed begins to run upon receipt of a decision on motion to recall. Adds procedural provisions concerning motions to recall. Provides that judicial review is stayed pending the disposition of a motion to recall. Provides that claims against the State are not subject to judicial review. Specifies venue for court review. Establishes procedures for providing collateral or guarantee of payment of an award if court review is not successfully prosecuted. Adds provisions regarding review by the Appellate Court and the Supreme Court. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
WORKER COMP/OCC DISEASE-APPEAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Tort Reform |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 305 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 310 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=640&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0640.htm |