IL SB0640 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0984
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0984
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title of the Telecommunications Article.
Title
ELECTRONIC FUND TRANS-SUPPORT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0984 |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Effective Date July 1, 2015 |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-045-000 |
2014-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2014-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2014-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2014-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2014-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2014-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 015-000-000 |
2014-04-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-16 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2014-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-010-000 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Kotowski |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Kotowski |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 006-000-000 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Financial Institutions |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Financial Institutions |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 13-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |