IL SB0632 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Alternative Public Schools Article of the School Code. With respect to alternative school programs, provides that each program shall receive funding in the amount of $30,000 plus an amount based on the ratio of the region's or Chicago's last 3 years' average daily attendance of pupils in grades 6 through 12 served by the alternative school program (rather than the best 3 months' average daily attendance in grades pre-kindergarten through 12) to the statewide totals of these amounts. Removes provisions concerning the calculation for determining the best 3 months' average daily attendance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-ALT SCH FUNDING-ADA

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-07SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED)
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Education
2017-01-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105513A-8Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback