IL SB0629 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0689
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0689
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.
Title
VEH CD-VIDEO EVENT RECORDER
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Biss [D] | Sen. William McCann [R] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] |
Sen. Chris Nybo [R] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-29 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0689 |
2016-07-29 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-07-29 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2016-05-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2016-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-05-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 006-000-000 |
2016-04-18 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-14 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-04-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2016 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Biss |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 2, 2016 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 6, 2015 |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Daniel Biss |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 5 | 2-201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |