IL SB0627 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0467
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0467
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Rivers, Lakes, and Streams Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning navigation.
Title
VEH CD-IGNITION INTERLOCK
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] | Sen. Jason Barickman [R] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] |
Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Kenneth Dunkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0467 |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 27, 2015 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2015-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000 |
2015-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2015-05-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2015-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-04 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2015-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Stadelman |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
615 | 5 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |