IL SB0626 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Provides that upon application by a facility, the Director of Public Health may grant or renew a waiver of certain staffing requirements for registered nurses, considering specified criteria, if the facility demonstrates to the Director's satisfaction that the facility is unable, despite diligent efforts, including offering wages at a competitive rate for registered nurses in the community, to employ the required number of registered nurses. Provides that the Director may not grant or renew such waivers for certain minimum nurse staffing requirements contained in federal regulations to facilities that are Medicare-certified or both Medicare-certified and Medicaid-certified. Provides that these waivers shall be reviewed quarterly by the Department of Public Health, including requiring a demonstration by the facility that it has continued to make diligent efforts to employ the required number of registered nurses, and shall be revoked for noncompliance with certain requirements. Effective immediately.
Title
NURSING HOME-STAFFING-NURSES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0217 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Effective Date August 18, 2017 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-001-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2017-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; McCann |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McCann |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 005-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Public Health; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Long Term Care |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 005-000-000 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 45 | 3-303.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |