IL SB0622 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision requiring the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to determine the quantity and quality of medical services provided under the State's Medical Assistance program, provides that such services may include dental and periodontal prevention and treatment services for residents of long term care facilities and adults diagnosed with a developmental disability or an acquired disability that is permanent and irreversible and that occurred prior to age 21. Provides that on or after July 1, 2017, the Department shall provide dental services, including periodontal prevention and treatment and prescription eyeglasses to veterans and their dependents. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-DENTAL SERVICES-VETS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care
2017-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care; 007-003-000
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care
2017-02-28SenateRe-referred to Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-02-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-02-01SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback