IL SB0607 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0082
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0082
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides an exemption from the prohibition on sale, manufacture, purchase, possession, or carrying of a switchblade knife to a person who possesses a currently valid Firearm Owner's Identification Card previously issued in his or her name by the Department of State Police or to a person or an entity engaged in the business of selling or manufacturing switchblade knives. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-SWITCHBLADES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0082 |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Effective Date August 11, 2017 |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-045-002 |
2017-05-18 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-18 | House | Motion - Move to Previous Question Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-04-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |