IL SB0584 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-09 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois AgrAbility Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-01-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-01-09SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2017-01-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 10, 2017
2017-01-09SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-09SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 10, 2017
2016-07-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2016-07-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2016-07-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2016-07-31SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2016-05-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016
2016-05-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2016-05-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2016-05-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2016-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2016-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2016-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2016-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-000-006
2016-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2016-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2016-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2016-05-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016
2016-04-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016
2016-04-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 14, 2016
2016-04-13SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2015-04-21SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2015-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015
2015-04-15SenateSecond Reading
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
2015-03-26SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2015-03-18SenateAssigned to Executive
2015-01-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-01-28SenateFirst Reading
2015-01-28SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
202351Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback