IL SB0574 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2016 - 50% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Terry Link
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Labor Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the powers of the Department of Labor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUSLIM AMERICAN ADV COUNCIL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-30SenateMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Terry Link
2016-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2016-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2016-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 050-004-000
2016-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
2016-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs
2016-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2016-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2016-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - May 30, 2016
2016-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3
2016-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2016-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-017-000
2016-05-27HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
2016-05-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2016-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2016-05-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2016-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
2016-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2016-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-05-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2016-05-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2016-05-19HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 013-000-000
2016-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2016-05-13HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2016-05-13HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
2016-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2016-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-05-09HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2016-05-09HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-04-22HouseArrived in House
2016-04-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 043-004-000
2016-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2016-04-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Collins
2016-04-22SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2016-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-002-000
2016-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
2016-04-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2016-04-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2016-04-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 14, 2016
2016-04-13SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2016-04-06SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2016-01-07SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2015-11-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2015-11-10SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2015-11-10SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 4, 2015
2015-10-10SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2015-10-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015
2015-05-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
2015-04-24SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015
2015-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015
2015-04-15SenateSecond Reading
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
2015-03-26SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2015-03-18SenateAssigned to Executive
2015-01-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-01-28SenateFirst Reading
2015-01-28SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2015051505-20Amended CodeCitation Text
20150543.13Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=574&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99
Texthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0574.htm
Texthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0574eng.htm
Texthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0574enr.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0574sam001.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0574ham001.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0574ham002.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0574ham003.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB0574_04222016_001000T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/house/09900SB0574_05292016_003000T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB0574_05312016_017000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback