IL SB0571 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0615
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0615
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Energy Conservation and Coal Development Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the evaluation of loan applications.
Title
ENTERPRISE ZONES-APPLICATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0615 |
2016-07-22 | Senate | Effective Date July 22, 2016 |
2016-07-22 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2016-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2016-05-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-000-001 |
2016-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-05-29 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-05-29 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-000-001 |
2016-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2016-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2016-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2016-05-23 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2016-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2016-05-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2016-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2016-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2016-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2016-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2016-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2016-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2016-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2016-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2016-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2016-04-27 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2016-04-18 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-14 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2016-04-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2016 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 2, 2016 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 4, 2015 |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1105 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |