IL SB0551 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Urban Development Authority Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
LOCAL GOVT DEBT REFORM-BONDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-05 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-28 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1138 |
2012-12-28 | Senate | Effective Date June 1, 2013 |
2012-12-28 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-12-05 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 050-000-000 |
2012-12-04 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000 |
2012-12-04 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2012-11-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-11-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2012-11-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-11-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 29, 2012 |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2012-11-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2012-11-28 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2012-11-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-11-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-11-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2012-11-28 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2012-11-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000 |
2012-11-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-11-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-11-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2012-11-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-11-09 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2013 |
2012-11-09 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2012-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000 |
2012-05-24 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-05-24 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-000-000 |
2012-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 29, 2012 |
2012-05-17 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2012-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2012-05-11 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-05-11 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 18, 2012 |
2012-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2012-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2012-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000 |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 007-000-000 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2012 |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 531 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |