IL SB0550 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1490
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1490
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning Chicago teachers.
Title
PEN CD-CHICAGO POLICE & FIRE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-30 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1490 | |
2010-12-30 | Governor Approved | |
2010-12-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-12-01 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-12-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 | |
2010-12-01 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 | |
2010-12-01 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2010-12-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Pensions and Investments; 009-000-000 | |
2010-12-01 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Pensions and Investments; 009-000-000 | |
2010-12-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Pensions and Investments | |
2010-12-01 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Pensions and Investments | |
2010-12-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2010-12-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2010-12-01 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2010-12-01 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2010-11-30 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2010-11-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - December 1, 2010 | |
2010-11-30 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 | |
2010-11-30 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2010-11-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-11-29 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel and Pensions Committee; 006-000-000 | |
2010-11-23 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee | |
2010-11-23 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-11-23 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy | |
2010-11-17 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-17 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 006-004-000 | |
2010-11-17 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel and Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-11-17 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Personnel and Pensions Committee | |
2010-11-10 | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee | |
2010-11-10 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 11, 2011 | |
2010-04-23 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-22 | First Reading | |
2010-03-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-22 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy | |
2010-03-18 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading - Passed; 051-004-001 | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; DeLeo | |
2010-03-18 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Pensions and Investments; 008-000-000 | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Pensions and Investments | |
2010-03-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo | |
2010-03-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2010 | |
2010-03-15 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | |
2010-03-15 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James A. DeLeo | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 28, 2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |