IL SB0545 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Specialized Mental Health Rehabilitation Act of 2013. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to establish a demonstration pilot program for crisis stabilization services for residents of facilities licensed under the Act. Provides that the pilot program shall be undertaken to prevent unnecessary inpatient hospitalization for behavioral health services. Provides that the licensure of crisis stabilization units by the Department of Public Health shall not be required in order for a facility to qualify for participation in the pilot program. Requires a facility to have had a contractual relationship with a Medicaid managed care organization for the delivery of crisis stabilization services on or before the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that the pilot program shall only be offered to individuals who are enrolled in Medicaid managed care plans and reside in facilities that are participating in the pilot program. Requires a participating facility, in conjunction with the Medicaid managed care organization, to collect data including, but not limited to: patient diagnosis, required treatment, duration of stay, and cost of treatment. Requires the Department to collect the data from the facilities and compile a report that compares the costs of the pilot program to similar inpatient care for diagnosis. Provides that the rate for crisis stabilization services under the pilot program shall be negotiated but in no instance may it be less than 150% of the rate in effect for recovery and rehabilitation services. Provides that the pilot program shall have a 3-year duration and shall consist of no more than 40 beds. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
DHFS-CRISIS STABILIZATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Health |
2021-03-09 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Public Health |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=545&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0545.htm |