IL SB0544 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0994
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0994
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning instituting proceedings in the case of addicted minors.
Title
COURT CLERK-CIVIL CASE FEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0994 |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date July 1, 2019 |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-001-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2018-05-25 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-039-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-23 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-05-16 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 4-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |