IL SB0528 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0307
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0307
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Removes the President of the Senate or his designee from the Board of Trustees of the System. Adds a member of the Senate appointed by the President to the Board of Trustees of the System. Makes a conforming change. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-GA-BOARD OF TRUSTEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0307 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-001 |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 100 | 5-90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |