IL SB0521 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on November 9 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Prompt Payment Act. Makes a technical change concerning examination of vouchers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GO BOND AUTHORIZATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-09 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-09SenateSent to the Governor
2017-11-09SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-11-09SenateSenate Concurs
2017-11-09SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2017-11-09SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2017-11-09Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-11-09SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-11-09SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-11-09SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-11-09SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-11-09SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-11-09SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-11-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - November 9, 2017
2017-11-09SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2017-11-08HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-012-000
2017-11-08House3/5 Vote Required
2017-11-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-11-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-11-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2017-11-08SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-11-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-11-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-000-000
2017-11-06HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2017-11-06HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-11-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-11-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-10-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017
2017-10-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
2017-10-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-10-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-08-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-08-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-08-23HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-05-29HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-28HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-24HouseArrived in House
2017-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 036-022-000
2017-05-23Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Trotter
2017-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305404Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=521&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0521.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0521eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0521enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0521sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0521ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0521ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0521_05232017_018000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0521_11082017_014000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0521ham002_11092017_006001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0521ham001_11092017_006000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback