IL SB0514 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Tobacco Products Tax Act of 1995. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning sales of tobacco products that are exempt from the tax imposed by the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TAXATION-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-29SenateSent to the Governor
2016-12-01SenatePassed Both Houses
2016-12-01SenateSenate Concurs
2016-12-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 051-000-000
2016-12-01SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 051-000-000
2016-12-01Senate3/5 Vote Required
2016-12-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2016-12-01SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2016-12-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2016-12-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pat McGuire
2016-12-01SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2016-12-01SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pat McGuire
2016-12-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - December 1, 2016
2016-12-01SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2016-11-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-007-000
2016-11-30House3/5 Vote Required
2016-11-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2016-11-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pat McGuire
2016-11-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2016-11-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto
2016-11-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2016-11-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2016-11-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2016-11-22HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2016-11-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2016-11-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2016-05-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-05-03HouseFirst Reading
2016-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-04-22HouseArrived in House
2016-04-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2016-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2016-04-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hutchinson
2016-04-22SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2016-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 012-000-000
2016-04-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2016-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2016-04-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2016-04-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2016-04-06SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2016-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2016
2016-04-06SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2015-10-10SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2015-10-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015
2015-05-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
2015-04-24SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015
2015-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015
2015-04-15SenateSecond Reading
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
2015-03-26SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2015-03-18SenateAssigned to Executive
2015-01-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-01-28SenateFirst Reading
2015-01-28SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3514310-15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=514&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0514.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0514eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0514enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0514sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0514ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0514ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB0514_04222016_012000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/house/09900SB0514_11302016_015000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB0514_12012016_009001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB0514_12012016_009000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback