IL SB0513 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Rivers, Lakes, and Streams Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the jurisdiction of the Department of Natural Resources under the Act.
Title
TRANSPORTATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Special Issues (TR) |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
615 | 5 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |