IL SB0507 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Removes the selection of construction-related professional services from the list items that provisions concerning HUBZone business contracts do not apply to. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUB ZONE BUSINESS CONTRACTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2022-02-07SenateTo Executive- Procurement
2022-01-05SenateRe-assigned to Executive
2021-04-16SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-03-10SenateTo Executive- Procurement
2021-03-03SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-02-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3050045-95Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback