IL SB0504 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0667
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0667
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Building Commission Act. Makes a technical change to a Section concerning the short title.
Title
MUNI CD-TIF DISTRICT-CHICAGO
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] |
Rep. Daniel Burke [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0667 |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Effective Date June 25, 2014 |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 010-001-000 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government |
2014-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2014 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-011-000 |
2014-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2014-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2014-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2014-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-05-27 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-05-27 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000 |
2014-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2014-05-21 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-21 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-05-16 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2014-04-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-16 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2014-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-001 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Muñoz |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 013-000-001 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 013-000-001 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Local Government |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 20 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |