IL SB0486 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0781
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0781
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Simplified Municipal Telecommunications Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning legislative intent.
Title
PROP TX-SOLAR ENERGY SYSTEMS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0781 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date August 10, 2018 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Senate Concurs 055-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 055-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3, 4 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3, 4 |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2018-05-29 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-05-16 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 7, 2018 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading June 29, 2017 |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 636 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |