IL SB0484 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Water Company Invested Capital Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PTELL-EXTENSION LIMITATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 59 N: 46 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Motion in House (Y: 64 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-06-28HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Lost 059-046-000
2017-06-28House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-06-28HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2017-06-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-28HouseFiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
2017-06-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed 068-048-000
2017-06-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-06-28HouseHome Rule Note Request is Inapplicable
2017-06-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed 068-048-000
2017-06-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-06-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-06-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-06-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-27HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-27HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-001-002
2017-06-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-06-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-06-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-06-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-06-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-06-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-06-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-06-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-06-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-06-21HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-06-21HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-06-21HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-06-21HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-31HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-30HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-30HouseArrived in House
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 037-011-009
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; J. Cullerton
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton
2017-05-30SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
356251Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback