IL SB0453 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-08 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-08 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title of the Act.
Title
SAFE SCHOOLS/HEALTHY LEARNING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-08 - House - Motion in House (Y: 58 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-11-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-11-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 058-050-000 |
2017-11-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-11-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-11-08 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-11-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-11-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-11-02 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017 |
2017-11-02 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2017-11-02 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2017-11-02 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-05-30 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 011-005-000 |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-30 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-05-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-05-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-05-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 032-019-000 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Lightford |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 007-003-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115 | 5 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |