IL SB0448 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0400
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0400
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fire Sprinkler Dormitory Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title of the Act.
Title
SIU SCHOOL OF DENTAL MEDICINE
Sponsors
Sen. James Clayborne [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0400 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-05-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Clayborne |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 009-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 47 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |