IL SB0421 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AIRPORT AUTHORITIES-DRONES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-28SenateSent to the Governor
2017-07-01SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-07-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 048-000-000
2017-07-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 048-000-000
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 012-000-000
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 012-000-000
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-06-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - June 28, 2017
2017-06-27SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2017-06-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2017-06-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-06-25HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-06-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-06-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-06-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-06-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 006-000-000
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-27HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-03-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2017-03-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-02-28SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6551-1-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=421&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0421.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0421eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0421enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0421sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0421ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0421ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0421_04262017_090000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0421_06262017_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0421_07012017_002001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0421_07012017_002000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback