IL SB0396 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Economic Development Act of 2017. Contains only a short title provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH-LOW-SPEED ELECTRIC BICYCLE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-23SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-26SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-005-000
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-05-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-15HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-15HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-05-11HouseArrived in House
2017-05-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Steans
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Steans
2017-05-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 015-000-000
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 015-000-000
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Transportation
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2017-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-02-28SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback