IL SB0391 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0616
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0616
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision concerning mental health services for children, requires a statewide association representing physicians to establish, within a specified time period, a clear process by which an eligible youth, emerging adult, or transition-age adult, or the youth's or emerging adult's parents, guardian, or caregiver, is identified, notified, and educated about the Family Support Program and the Specialized Family Support Program upon a first psychiatric inpatient hospital admission, and any following psychiatric inpatient admissions. Provides that upon a youth's, emerging adult's or transition-age adult's second psychiatric inpatient hospital admission, prior to hospital discharge, the hospital must, if it is aware of the patient's prior psychiatric inpatient hospital admission, ensure that the youth's parents, guardian, or caregiver, or the emerging adult or transition-age adult, have been notified of the Family Support Program and the Specialized Family Support Program. Provides that, if a dependent youth has been left at a psychiatric hospital beyond medical necessity, prior to referring the youth to the Department of Children and Family Services the psychiatric hospital shall attempt to contact the youth and the youth's parents, guardian, or caregiver about the Family Support Program and the Specialized Family Support Program, and shall provide educational materials on those programs. Provides that no State agency or hospital shall be prohibited from discussing medical treatment options or a referral to legal counsel with a parent or guardian of a youth admitted to a psychiatric hospital inpatient unit. Effective immediately.
Title
MED ASSISTANCE-MENTAL HEALTH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0616 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Effective Date December 20, 2019 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-11-14 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000 |
2019-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-11-12 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2019-11-12 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services |
2019-11-12 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-12 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 12, 2019 |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-10-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-10-30 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-10-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-10-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-001-000 |
2019-10-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-10-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019 |
2019-10-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2019-10-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-10-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2019-10-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-10-28 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-10-28 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-08 | House | To Special Issues (ACSI) |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |