IL SB0374 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to increase reimbursement rates to facilities licensed under the Nursing Home Care Act on January 1 of 2022 through 2025 to a level that is sufficient to pay wages of not less than the State minimum wage rates in effect on each of those dates. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to provide that the Department shall adopt rules, including emergency rules, to implement the rate increases. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHFS-NURSING RATE INCREASES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2021-04-16SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-03-03SenateTo Appropriations- Health
2021-03-03SenateAssigned to Appropriations
2021-02-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-19SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-19SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-41New CodeSee Bill Text
51005-45.8New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback