IL SB0338 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0273
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0273
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning valuation statements.
Title
CIGARETTE TAX-LITTLE CIGARS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0273 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-043-000 |
2013-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2013-05-09 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-05-09 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000 |
2013-05-02 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2013-04-29 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 041-006-000 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2013 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 010-001-000 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 010-002-000 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 12-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |