IL SB0318 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be construed to limit the right of persons licensed under the Act to delegate tasks or duties to licensed or unlicensed personnel who have the training or experience to perform the tasks or duties so delegated. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAL PRAC-DELEGATION TASKS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-27 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-24 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0618 | |
2009-08-24 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-24 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-27 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 | |
2009-05-26 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 | |
2009-05-22 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities | |
2009-05-21 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-21 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 21, 2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-006-002 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-07 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-07 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | |
2009-05-07 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-07 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-04-22 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz | |
2009-04-22 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons | |
2009-04-22 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-04-22 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke | |
2009-04-22 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David E. Miller | |
2009-04-21 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2009-04-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-04-21 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-04-20 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-04-16 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-02 | First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Silverstein | |
2009-04-02 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities | |
2009-03-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-03-16 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-03-13 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 006-000-000 | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Held in Licensed Activities | |
2009-03-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted | |
2009-03-06 | Postponed - Licensed Activities | |
2009-03-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Licensed Activities | |
2009-03-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-03-04 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to Licensed Activities | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |