IL SB0317 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
Pending: House Revenue & Finance Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 10:30 am in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
Pending: House Revenue & Finance Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 10:30 am in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In provisions concerning delinquencies by lessees of property owned by a taxing district, provides that such a delinquency occurs 60 days after the final (currently, second) installment due date. Provides that those provisions apply in all counties (currently, in counties with more than 800,000 but fewer than 1,000,000 inhabitants). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-TAXING DISTRICTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2024-04-02 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-03-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 8, 2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 21-16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |