IL SB0285 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-02 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-02 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that a vacancy in the office of U.S. Senator shall be filled at a special election, rather than by temporary gubernatorial appointment, when the vacancy occurs more than one year before the next general election. Effective immediately.
Title
U.S. SENATOR SPECIAL ELECTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-02 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Brady | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-13 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-13 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2009-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy | |
2009-02-27 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter | |
2009-02-27 | To Executive Subcommittee on Ethics | |
2009-02-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Executive Subcommittee on Ethics | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2009-02-24 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-24 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy | |
2009-02-20 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John O. Jones | |
2009-02-20 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins | |
2009-02-20 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-02-19 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Luechtefeld | |
2009-02-18 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-18 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=285&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB0285.htm |