IL SB0274 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0664
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0664
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Legislative Commission Reorganization Act of 1984. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-11-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0664 |
2012-01-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 13, 2012 |
2012-01-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-11-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2011-11-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-11-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-11-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-11-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-11-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-11-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2011 |
2011-11-22 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2011-11-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-11-09 | House | First Reading |
2011-11-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2011-11-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-11-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2011-11-08 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sullivan |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2011-11-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-11-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 8, 2011 |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 10, 2011 |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 130 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |