IL SB0270 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that beginning July 1, 2021, all FDA approved prescription medications that are recognized by a generally accepted standard medical reference as effective in the treatment of conditions specified in the most recent Diagnostic and Statistical Manual of Mental Disorders published by the American Psychiatric Association must be covered under both fee-for-service and managed care medical assistance programs for persons who are otherwise eligible for medical assistance and shall not be subject to any (i) utilization control, (ii) prior authorization mandate, or (iii) lifetime restriction limit mandate. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
MEDICAID-PRESCRIPTION MEDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Directed to Multiple Committees Behavioral and Mental Health Committee, Appropriations- Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=270&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0270.htm |