IL SB0265 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Energy Assistance Act. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity may not set the annual eligibility level for energy assistance higher than 60% of the State median income as established by the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. Requires the Department to ensure that households with children under the age of 6 years old are offered a priority application period. Provides that the Supplemental Low-Income Energy Assistance Fund is not subject to sweeps, administrative charge-backs, or any other fiscal or budgetary maneuver that would in any way transfer any amounts from the Supplemental Low-Income Energy Assistance Fund into any other fund of the State. Contains provisions concerning certain unspent funds being utilized for weatherization expenses; allowances to Local Administrative Agencies for administrative expenses; incremental changes to the monthly energy assistance charges billed to utility customers; Department reports on monies collected and allocated to utilities for implementation of their Percentage of Income Payment Plans; and other matters. Provides that all energy assistance programs under the Act shall be available to eligible residents regardless of immigration status.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIHEAP-ENERGY ASSISTANCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenateSent to the Governor
2021-06-01SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-06-01SenateSenate Concurs
2021-06-01SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 036-017-000
2021-06-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
2021-06-01SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2021-06-01SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-25SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Energy and Public Utilities
2021-05-24SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-24SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2021-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2021-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2021
2021-05-21SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-05-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-046-000
2021-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-12HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-12HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-006-000
2021-05-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2021-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2021-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2021-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-04-28HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-04-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-04-28HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-04-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-04-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2021-04-28HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-22HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-04-22HouseArrived in House
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2021-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 044-015-000
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hastings
2021-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
2021-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-04-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 018-000-000
2021-04-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-04-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2021-04-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
2021-04-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 13, 2021
2021-04-07SenateDo Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 012-003-000
2021-03-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2021-03-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-02-24SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2021-02-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-17SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-17SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3052013Amended CodeCitation Text
3052018Amended CodeCitation Text
3052020New CodeSee Bill Text
305206Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback