IL SB0264 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0637
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Makes various appropriations and reappropriations for specified purposes. Amends Public Act 101-7 by changing and adding various appropriations. Some provisions are effective immediately; some provisions are effective July 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$APPROP/REAPPROP/SUPPLEMENTAL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-23 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-10SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0637
2020-06-10SenateEffective Date June 10, 2020
2020-06-10SenateGovernor Approved
2020-06-08SenateSent to the Governor
2020-05-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2020-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2020-05-24SenateSenate Concurs
2020-05-24SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Senate Concurs 037-019-000
2020-05-23SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2020-05-23SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2020-05-23SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
2020-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 5 - May 23, 2020
2020-05-23SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 5
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2020-05-23HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-23HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2020-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-044-000
2020-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted
2020-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion Prevailed to Suspend Rule by Voice Vote
2020-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion Filed to Suspend House Rule(s) for Immediate Consideration Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Withdrawn by Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-23HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
2020-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2020-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2020-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2020-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-005-000
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-21HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000
2020-05-21HouseLegislation Considered in Special Session No. 1
2020-05-20HouseSuspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
2020-05-20HouseMoved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-20HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2020-05-20HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-05-20HouseFirst Reading
2020-05-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2020-05-20HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-20HouseArrived in House
2020-05-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2020-05-20SenateThird Reading - Passed; 036-019-000
2020-05-20SenateLegislation Considered in Special Session No. 1
2020-05-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2020-05-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2020-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2020
2020-05-19SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2020-01-20SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2019-07-03SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2019
2019-05-28SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateDo Pass Appropriations II; 010-000-005
2019-02-27SenateRe-assigned to Appropriations II
2019-02-27SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=264&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/PDF/10100SB0264.pdf
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/PDF/10100SB0264eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/PDF/10100SB0264enr.pdf
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/Approps/101-0637.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/PDF/10100SB0264sam001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/PDF/10100SB0264ham001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/PDF/10100SB0264ham002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/PDF/10100SB0264ham003.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/PDF/10100SB0264ham004.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/PDF/10100SB0264ham005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0264_05202020_002000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0264ham005_05232020_014000C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB0264_05232020_008000T.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback