IL SB0263 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Broadband Access on Passenger Rail Law. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
IDOT-CONTRACTORS-EVALUATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 29, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-011-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-22 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-02-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-02-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-11-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-11-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-11-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-11-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-11-06 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-11-06 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-11-06 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-11-06 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-11-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-11-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-11-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-11-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-11-06 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-11-06 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-11-06 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-11-06 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017 |
2017-11-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-11-06 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-11-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-11-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-11-06 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-11-06 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-11-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-11-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-11-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-11-03 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Clayborne |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2712 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |