IL SB0262 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Taxation Disclosure Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MINORITY/WOMEN-OWNED BUSINESS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0391
2017-08-25SenateEffective Date August 25, 2017
2017-08-25SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-05-11HouseArrived in House
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 6 Adopted; Clayborne
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Clayborne
2017-05-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 6 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Assignments
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to State Government
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - State Government
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government
2017-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-03-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government
2017-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2017-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
2017-03-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-14SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2025301Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=262&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0262.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0262eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0262enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0391.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0262sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0262sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0262sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0262sam004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0262sam005.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0262sam006.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0262ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0262_05102017_003000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0262_05302017_075000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0262_05312017_082000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback