IL SB0231 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title of the Act.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 21 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-06-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016 |
2016-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2016-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2016-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2016-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2016-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2016-05-19 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Avery Bourne |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2016-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2016-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2016-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2016-05-16 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2016-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-05-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2016-05-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 031-021-003 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Manar |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Manar |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-002-004 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-001-006 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 6, 2016 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115 | 5 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |