IL SB0225 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall not provide facial recognition search services or photographs obtained in the process of issuing an identification card or a driver's license or permit to any federal, State, or local law enforcement agency or other governmental entity for the purpose of enforcing federal immigration laws. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SOS-FACIAL RECOGNITION INFO

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 47 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 040-018-000
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 009-006-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Celina Villanueva
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2021
2021-05-27SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2021-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-047-001
2021-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 008-000-000
2021-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Immigration & Human Rights Committee
2021-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2021-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2021-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 008-000-000
2021-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-22HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2021-04-22HouseArrived in House
2021-04-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 037-014-000
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021
2021-04-21SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 007-001-000
2021-04-20SenateReported Back To Judiciary; 003-000-000
2021-04-16SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2021-03-09SenateTo Judiciary- Privacy
2021-02-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-02-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-17SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-17SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1533511Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-110.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback