IL SB0219 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0486
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0486
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning unfair labor practice procedures.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0486 |
2015-11-20 | Senate | Effective Date November 20, 2015 |
2015-11-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-10-30 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-10-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-001-001 |
2015-10-20 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-09-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015 |
2015-09-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-09-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-09-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-09-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000 |
2015-08-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015 |
2015-08-25 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2015-08-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015 |
2015-08-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-08-25 | House | First Reading |
2015-08-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2015-08-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2015-08-19 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As August 19, 2015 |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115 | 5 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |