IL SB0210 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0585
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0585
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
BATH SALTS PROHIBITION ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] |
Rep. Jerry Costello [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-18 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0585 |
2016-07-18 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-07-18 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2016-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2016-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2016-05-13 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2016-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Manar |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Manar |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 17, 2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |