IL SB0200 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1067
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1067
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Worker Adjustment and Retraining Notification Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
EMS EMPLOYEES-MEAL PERIODS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1067 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Effective Date August 24, 2018 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 020-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-05-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Labor & Commerce Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-28 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Muñoz |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 65 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |