IL SB0200 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the nomination of candidates for the General Assembly.
Title
ELECTIONS-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-005-000 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2014 |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 23, 2014 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2014 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 8-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |